HI SB429 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts uniform laws on protecting the online accounts of employees, unpaid interns, applicants, students, and prospective students from employers and educational institutions, respectively. (SB429 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Employee And Student Online Privacy Protection Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K. Kahele, Baker, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Gabbard. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto, Holt Co-Chairs; McKelvey, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 554). |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1748) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 163) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL/HRE, CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE/JDL, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB814 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
SB429 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325.
SB429 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325.