HI SB429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows remote dispensing pharmacies to operate on islands without a pharmacy, provide medications to patients with health insurance, and dispense controlled substances.
Title
Remote Dispensing Pharmacy; Better Access to Medications
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 2:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=429&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB429_.HTM |