HI SB42 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to review the safety records of nearshore areas statewide; appropriates funds for swimming buoys at Kaanapali beach. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Ocean Safety; Swimming Buoys; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 276) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-10-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |