HI SB419 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 091, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 091, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows neighborhood board members to attend certain public meetings without violating the Sunshine Law under certain circumstances. (CD1)
Title
Neighborhood Boards; Public Meetings; Permitted Interactions
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 091, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 091, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1191). |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 656). |
2015-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto Chang, Jordan voting no (3) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 05-01-15. |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 5) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-15. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 5). |
2015-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Brower, Thielen. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 434). |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1374) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision-making on Tuesday 03-31-15, at 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-15 at 2:10 PM in room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-27-15 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 128) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 406) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 1:05PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |