HI SB416 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB416

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies applicable reimbursement to the State or defendant for expert witness fees, as it pertains to testimony, preparation and in-court attendance in state court criminal proceedings. Increases per diem payments for all witnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Witness Fees And Reimbursements In Criminal Cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to JDC .
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB182 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB416 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback