HI SB415 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 047, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 047, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes general contractors entering into or under contracts in the State for work on buildings, structures, or other private construction works liable for debt incurred by subcontractors for wages due to claimants, including interest owed, for performance of labor in the contract between the general contractor and owner. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Wages.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Act 047, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2023-06-01 | House | Act 047, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1147). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 902). |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-18-23. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-23. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-23 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 557). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 544). |
2023-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-31 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-03-23. |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1863) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan. |
2023-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Sayama, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Alcos. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-21-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 162) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Richards. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Richards ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 367) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to GVO, CPN. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB167 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.