HI SB415 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Act 012, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Act 012, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies bicycle turn and stop signals.
Title
Bicycle Signals
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Act 012, 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112). |
2015-04-21 | House | Act 012, on 4/21/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1377), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1116), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, LoPresti, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-23-15 11:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, English, Espero, Kouchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Kidani. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRA. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=415&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB415_.HTM |