HI SB402 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 205, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 205, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that expenditures by candidate committees may be made to reimburse other individuals for expenditures advanced by those individuals, in addition to those advanced by the candidate. Deletes candidate reimbursements from the category of expenditures that noncandidate committees must itemize in their reports, since noncandidate committees are not allowed to receive or make loans under existing law. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Reimbursements For Expenditures By Committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | House | Act 205, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 205, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakashima, Wildberger, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 2:45PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:45PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 808). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Nakashima, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Acasio, Fevella. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 457). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1824), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1437), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-05 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-05-21 11:10AM. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-03-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 18 |
2021-02-24 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 54). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-23-21. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 9:15AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC . |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB142 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).