HI HB142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB142
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that expenditures by candidate committees may be made to reimburse other individuals for expenditures advanced by those individuals, in addition to those advanced by the candidate. Deletes "candidate reimbursements" from the category of expenditures that noncandidate committees must itemize in their reports since noncandidate committees are not allowed to receive or make loans under existing law. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Reimbursements For Expenditures By Committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 37) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB142 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB402 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Act 205, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
SB402 (Same As) 2021-07-07 - Act 205, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).