HI SB399 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB399

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to CPC/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ties the authorized benefit for acupuncture treatments allowed under personal injury protection benefits provided through motor vehicle insurance to the workers' compensation supplemental medical fee schedule. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseRe-referred to CPC/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-03-07HouseReferred to CPC/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 26
2017-03-07HousePass First Reading
2017-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-02SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-17.
2017-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 654) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2017-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-17 1:45PM in conference room 211.
2017-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
2017-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-02-10SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman.
2017-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB235 (Same As)
SB399 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Referred to CPC/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 26

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback