HI SB388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act 271, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Act 271, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1391).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to establish a task force to create a system for evaluating and assessing all children and those who are exhibiting emergent or persistent behaviors, academic challenges, or chronic absenteeism and are in need of appropriate supports and interventions accessible within the continuum of a multi-tiered system of supports. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Act 271, 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1391). |
2019-07-12 | House | Act 271, on 07/09/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1391). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 138) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 138). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 3:10PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 3:05PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 657). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2117), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1658) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4). |
2019-03-15 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1314) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-15-19 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-14-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 129) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU/HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |