HI SB379 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a virtual net metering pilot program for renewable energy projects to be proportionally allocated between utilities. Provides the opportunity for the commission to revise the bill credit mechanism for renewable energy credits.
Title
Renewable Energy; Public Utilities; Virtual Net Metering
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to ENE, CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB94 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=379&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB379_.HTM |