HI SB367 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes the twenty year maximum period for issuance of permit for commercial thrill craft and parasailing activities. (SD1)
Title
Commercial Thrill Craft Permit Renewal
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-04 | (S) The committee on WTL deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-04-09 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-09 2:45pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. | |
2009-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT will hold a public decision making on 02-16-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 1:15 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to EDT, WTL. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |