HI SB364 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a professional tour guide certification task force to determine whether it is appropriate to require persons who use various state resources for commercial purposes or apply for various commercial use permits to hold and maintain certification or meet certain minimum requirements, recommend existing certificates or certification programs that may be appropriate, and make recommendations and plans regarding any necessary certifications and certification renewals. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 105) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/HRE/WTL, WAM/CPH. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET/HRE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/HRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/HRE/WTL, CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/HRE/WTL, WAM/CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1108 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB364 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB364 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to TIA/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Commercial Instructor and Operator Permits
Commercial Use Permits
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Na Ala Hele Trails
State Parks
Sustainable Tourism
Tour Guides
Tourism
Commercial Instructor and Operator Permits
Commercial Use Permits
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Na Ala Hele Trails
State Parks
Sustainable Tourism
Tour Guides
Tourism