HI SB364 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a process for the recounting of ballots cast in a contest. Authorizes that contests for cause challenging a contest result may also be based upon unlawful activity or force majeure. (SB364 HD1)
Title
Elections; Recount; Supreme Court; Contests for Cause
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Ihara, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 506). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-20-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 117) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 804) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB125 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1