HI SB363 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB363
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Rent Reporting for Credit Pilot Program within the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation (HHFDC) that sunsets on 6/30/2027. Requires a report to the governor and legislature. Requires HHFDC to develop a series of state-sponsored public service announcements to increase tenant awareness of the existing opportunities within the credit reporting industry to report rent payments to boost credit scores. Appropriates funds for one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) position to support the pilot program. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Aquino, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HOU, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB363 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
HB817 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
HB817 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Landlords
Position
Public Service Announcements
Rent Payment Information
Rent Reporting for Credit Pilot Program
Report
Tenants
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Landlords
Position
Public Service Announcements
Rent Payment Information
Rent Reporting for Credit Pilot Program
Report
Tenants