HI SB358 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of the environmental response, energy, and food security tax collections to be deposited into the environmental response revolving fund, energy security special fund, and agricultural development and food security special fund. Ensures that the environmental response, energy, and food security tax applies to all fossil fuels. (SD1)
Title
Energy; Barrel Tax; Environmental Response, Energy, and Food Security Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from ENE/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-10-15 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to ENE/AGL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |