HI SB357 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB357
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to upgrade the sound system in the auditorium and conference rooms at the state capitol.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on TEC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 3:05PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB357 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee on TEC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Capitol Auditorium
Capitol Conference Rooms
Department of Accounting and General Services
Capitol Auditorium
Capitol Conference Rooms
Department of Accounting and General Services
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=357&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB357_.HTM |