HI SB348 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 161, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 161, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the federal law reference to standards established by the United States Food and Drug Administration regarding product quality standards for bottled water. Repeals the requirement that noncarbonated bottled water be transported, stored, processed, or bottled through lines or equipment through which only water is passed. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Bottled Water.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Act 161, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263). |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Act 161, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263). |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 69) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 69). |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Johanson, Cullen, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 9:30AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 407). |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1683), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-31-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 89) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Same As) 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).