HI HB562 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB562
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement that noncarbonated bottled water be transported, stored, processed, or bottled through lines or equipment through which only water is passed. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Bottled Water.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB562 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
SB348 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 161, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263).
SB348 (Same As) 2021-07-02 - Act 161, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1263).