HI SB3372 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain disclosure and labelling requirements for food, products, and dietary supplements containing kratom. Prohibits the distribution and sale of kratom products to minors. Imposes civil and criminal penalties for violations. Takes effect 1/1/2025.
Title
Relating To Kratom.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN/HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3372&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3372_.HTM |