HI SB3371 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parties to procurement protests to use best efforts to resolve issues at the procurement officer level before submission of a protest.
Title
Relating To The Procurement Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3371&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3371_.HTM |