HI SB337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a candidate committee shall not be required to file a statement of information for an electioneering communication made by a candidate committee that clearly identifies the communication as being paid for by the candidate committee. Repeals the requirement that a candidate committee file a statement of information of the names and addresses of all persons who contributed to the committee or the organization for the purpose of publishing or broadcasting the electioneering communications. Excludes any advertisement by a candidate or candidate committee from the reporting requirements for electioneering communication, provided that the advertisement is in compliance with the law regarding advertisements. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 129) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1238 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB337 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
SB337 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27