HI SB3340 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii College of Tropical Agriculture and Human Resources, in consultation with livestock industry stakeholders, to conduct a study to assess the effects of heat stress on beef cattle during interisland ocean transportation. Requires a report to the Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 7/1/2055. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Livestock.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2671) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Fukunaga, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hashimoto. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE will hold a public decision making on 02-13-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Beef Cattle Interisland Ocean Transportation Study
CTAHR
Expenditure Ceiling
Livestock
Report
UH
Beef Cattle Interisland Ocean Transportation Study
CTAHR
Expenditure Ceiling
Livestock
Report
UH