HI SB3337 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reestablishes the appraisal management company registration program within the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Clarifies that chapter 466L, Hawaii Revised Statutes, is repealed. Applies registration requirements retroactively to 6/30/2023. Appropriates moneys. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025.
Title
Relating To Appraisal Management Companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2641 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 080, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).
Subjects
Appraisal Management Companies
Appropriation
DCCA
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Reestablishment
Registration Program
Appropriation
DCCA
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Reestablishment
Registration Program
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3337&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3337_.HTM |