HI SB3331 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an alternative process for the termination of the rental agreement that involves mediation. Requires the Governor to notify the Chief Justice, Legislature, and Revisor of Statutes when the final wildfire proclamation will expire. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Landlord-tenant Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 9:40AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2742 (Same As) 2024-07-08 - Act 202, 07/05/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Subjects
Appropriation
Failure to Pay Rent
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Governor Notice
Housing
Landlord-tenant Code
Mediation
Notice
Remedies
Wildfires
Failure to Pay Rent
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Governor Notice
Housing
Landlord-tenant Code
Mediation
Notice
Remedies
Wildfires
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3331&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3331_.HTM |