HI SB3326 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to create and annually update a wildfire hazard map. Requires private and public property owners to trim grasses within certain proximities of public rights of way and utility lines. Authorizes electric utility companies to enter private or public property to trim or remove hazardous vegetation. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Vegetation Management Near Utility Lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2645) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL/CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2766 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WAL/CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DLNR
Electric Utility Companies
Expenditure Ceiling
Fines
Hazardous Vegetation
Wildfire Mitigation
DLNR
Electric Utility Companies
Expenditure Ceiling
Fines
Hazardous Vegetation
Wildfire Mitigation