HI SB3290 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Disability and Communication Access Board to convene a working group to study the state of American Sign Language interpretation services in Hawaii. Requires a report to the Legislature, with the assistance of the Department of Health. (CD1)
Title
Relating To American Sign Language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Marten, Nishimoto, Amato, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 3:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-24 1:45PM; CR 329. |
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Awa. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Marten, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Amato, Garcia. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 766). |
2024-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 489). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 589). |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Souza excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1747-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ganaden, Gates, Martinez, Quinlan excused (5). |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1138-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Marten, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 319) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2934) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2576) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |