HI SB3287 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the fees that a towing company may charge to tow vehicles left unattended on private and public property. Allows a towing company or parking management company to charge a fee for the placement or removal of vehicle immobilization devices. Requires that a towing company that charges fees to tow vehicles left unattended on private and public property, or a towing company or parking management company that charges fees for the placement or removal of vehicle immobilization devices, to accept payment by the vehicle owner for charges by cash, credit card, and debit card and shall not direct an individual to use an on-site automated teller machine in lieu of accepting payment by credit card and debit card. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Towing Companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, McKelvey. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2870) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee on CPN has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 02-27-24 10:01AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2692) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-13-24 3:01PM; CR 224. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TCA, CPN. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |