HI SB3277 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a determination of ineligibility for tenant applicants for any program under the Hawaii Public Housing Authority law due to an eviction unless a writ of possession was issued and served as a result of the proceeding.
Title
Relating To Public Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3277&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3277_.HTM |