HI SB323 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendments to create a unicameral legislature to be known as the legislature which shall consist of fifty-one members serving four year terms; and which shall commence after the general election in November 2010. Provides that the speaker of the legislature and the minority leader shall each appoint four members to the reapportionment commission. Provides that the speaker of the legislature shall appoint four members to the judicial selection commission.
Title
Unicameral Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=323&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB323_.HTM |