HI SB3143 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Act 007, 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Act 007, 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms Hawaii income and estate and generation-skipping transfer tax laws to the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as amended as of December 31, 2021.
Title
Relating To Conformity To The Internal Revenue Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Act 007, 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107). |
2022-04-21 | House | Act 007, on 04/21/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 449). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-03-22 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1202-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-18 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-18-22 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 453). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3098) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2423) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Acasio, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2175 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
Subjects
Conformity to the Internal Revenue Code for 2021
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax
Estate and Generation-skipping Transfer Tax
Income Tax