HI SB3141 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HLT/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to HLT/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to track and publicly report certain data relating to crisis reports, emergency mental health transports, and court-ordered treatments. Requires the Department of Health to respond to reports about persons having severe mental illness who are in need of assistance, assess whether those persons may fulfill the criteria for assisted community treatment, and coordinate the process for an assisted community treatment order if indicated. Establishes that a court's denial of a petition for involuntary commitment shall serve as notification to the Department of Health that the person should be evaluated for assisted community treatment. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation to the Department of Health for software and data collection and publication. Makes an appropriation to the Department of Health for statewide education and training on policies related to emergency examination and hospitalization and assisted community treatment. Repeals the sunset date of Act 111, SLH 2017, which allows a patient who has been involuntarily committed to a psychiatric facility to be ordered to receive treatment over the patient's objection. Declares that the appropriations exceed the general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 283) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2859) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-24 9:46AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2465) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2452 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HLT/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
AG
Appropriation ($)
Assisted Community Treatment
DOH
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded
Judiciary
Mental Health
Reports
Appropriation ($)
Assisted Community Treatment
DOH
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded
Judiciary
Mental Health
Reports