HI SB314 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operating expenses of the University of Hawaii.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.