HI SB3139 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes deposits into the emergency and budget reserve fund by replacing general fund appropriations with general obligation bond proceeds and transferring savings from the Supplemental Appropriations Act of 2020. Transfers excess funds from other sources into the emergency and budget reserve fund. Effective 5/27/2020; provided that the general obligation bond authorization is effective 7/1/2020. (SB3139 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2020-05-22HouseReceived notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 534).
2020-05-21SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2020-05-19SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 05-21-20.
2020-05-19SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
2020-05-18HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-05-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Thielen excused (2).
2020-05-15HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-05-15HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-05-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 05-15-20 9:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
2020-05-11HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 05-13-20.
2020-05-08HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 05-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room Auditorium.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 503) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3011) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-20 12:25PM in conference room 211.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to WAM.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback