HI SB3105 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Lipoa point management special fund for the management of the Lipoa point area and educate visitors on how funding is used for the management of the Lipoa point area. Appropriates funds into and out of the Lipoa point management special fund. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-09-18 3:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 2:46PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2502 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to WAL/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 9