HI SB3100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates the Department of Budget and Finance and the Department of Human Resources Development into the Department of Budget, Finance, and Human Resources. Transfers functions and duties accordingly. Transfers to the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism (DBEDT) jurisdiction over cable TV and the Broadband Assistance Advisory Council from the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs and telecommunications carriers from the Public Utilities Commission. Establishes the position of a commissioner of telecommunications. Creates special fund in DBEDT for cable TV and telecommunications carriers. Requires the Broadband Assistance Advisory Council to advise the Director of DBEDT on broadband deployment. (SB3100 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Structure Of Government.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:30PM in conference room 429. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:30PM in conference room 429. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 812). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Tokuda, Keith-Agaran, Baker Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Matsumoto. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 475). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1872-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 420) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto, Ihara, Riviere, Taniguchi . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2859) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2209) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |