HI SB3090 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 225, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 225, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the purposes for which indirect costs incurred by the Department of Education, State Public Charter School Commission, or a charter authorizer from federal grants may be reimbursed. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Federal Indirect Overhead Reimbursements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 225, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 225, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 131-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 131-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Eli, Costales, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 3:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 2:10PM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 890). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Eli Co-Chairs; Costales, Okimoto. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 683). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1944-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, Quinlan, Yamane. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-15-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2755) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:20PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2122 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ward excused (2).
Subjects
Department of Education
Federal Indirect Overhead Reimbursements
State Public Charter School Commission
Federal Indirect Overhead Reimbursements
State Public Charter School Commission