HI SB3087 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 101, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 101, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a new Emergency Management Assistance Compact. Repeals the existing Emergency Management Assistance Compact. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Emergency Management Assistance Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 101, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 101, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 95-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 95-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Eli, Ohno, Nakashima, Perruso, Ichiyama, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 9:35AM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 9:35AM; Conference Room 229. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Eli, Ohno, Nakashima, Perruso Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Ward. |
2022-04-20 | House | Re-referred to PDP, CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Misalucha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1924-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Tokioka. |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1457-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CMV with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from PDP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CMV. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Costales, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP on Tuesday, 03-15-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to PDP, CMV, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 426) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2258) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2119 (Same As) 2022-04-20 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 883).