HI SB3084 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to LGO/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to LGO/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts Hawaii National Guard service members activated by the Governor or the Governor's designated representative to state active duty from enrollment in the Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii National Guard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to LGO/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 260) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2914) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from PSM/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2390) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM/LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2395 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 070, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1171).