HI SB3070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum amount of public funds available to certain state candidates in each election. Increases the amount of voluntary state income tax check-off contributions that may be designated for the Hawaii election campaign fund beginning on 1/1/2021.
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-03 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 58). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-28-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2959) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |