HI SB3067 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Recommitted to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Recommitted to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that real estate investment trusts file returns reporting their shareholders' pro rata shares of net income and net income attributable to this State. Requires withholding on all payments to shareholders. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommitted to WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2659) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Wakai ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-15-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |