HI SB3065 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to investigate the possibility of exchanging state land for land owned by Dole Food Company, Inc., and for costs of executing the exchange. (CD1)
Title
Exchange for Lands; Dole Food Company; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Deferred. |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Deferred one day 05-01-14. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 82-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 82-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Luke, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Nishihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:40PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-23-14 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 711). |
2014-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Solomon, Nishihara, Kidani Co-Chairs; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 652). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan, Say, Wooley voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1622-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1044-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee, Say, Fale. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-17-14 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2708) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making meeting on 02-26-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EGH/WTL/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Taniguchi. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/WTL/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EGH/WTL/AGL, WAM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |