HI SB3063 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to article IX, section 5, of the Constitution of the State of Hawaii, to require the State to place housing for its residents among its highest priorities and to implement this provision by statute. (SD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article Ix, Section 5, Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 476) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere, L. Thielen). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) S. Chang). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3361) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 11:10AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HOU/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2886) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU/JDC, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |