HI SB3063 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests that the University of Hawaii sea grant college program conduct an economic analysis of North Shore beaches for the area of the North Shore of Oahu that stretches from the Kawailoa to Waialee ahupuaa to estimate the economic value of North Shore beaches. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To An Economic Analysis Of Beaches On The North Shore Of Oahu.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2464) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HRE/ETT, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3063&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB3063_.HTM |