HI SB306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB306
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that projects that contain a combination of time share interests, transient vacation rentals, and private residential units located in the same project are required to provide basic documents that will enable an owner to sell the owner's time share interest. Specifies that a plan manager of a time share owners association or vacation club board of directors must provide specific information to owners regarding candidates for election to the board of directors within thirty days prior to the election and shall not have a controlling interest on the board of directors. (SB306 HD1)
Title
Relating To Real Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1349) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-23 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 120) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB306 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB650 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB650 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).