HI SB3059 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of planning to convene a workgroup for sustainability guidelines, establish benchmarks for measuring sustainability progress, and coordinate sustainability progress made by the State and counties. Authorizes the office of planning to contract for a coordinator or facilitator. (SD1)
Title
Sustainability; State Planning; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from EDT/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2365) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-14-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |