HI SB3053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows and regulates the manufacturing of edible cannabis products as manufactured cannabis products by licensed medical cannabis dispensaries. Establishes requirements for manufacturing, handling, labeling, and packaging of manufactured cannabis products. Takes effect on 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Edible Cannabis Products.
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |