HI SB3051 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a general excise tax exemption for the gross proceeds or income from the sale of groceries that are eligible under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, regardless of the means of purchase and the SNAP eligibility of the purchaser, and prescription drugs.
Title
Relating To General Excise Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-18 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3051&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB3051_.HTM |