HI SB3046 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Act 021, 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Act 021, 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an emergency appropriation to the department of the attorney general for use in major litigation involving the State. Extends the lapsing date to 6/30/2023. (HD2)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of The Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Act 021, 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). |
2022-05-06 | House | Act 021, on 05/05/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 882). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella, Keohokalole. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-20-22. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-22. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 677). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1953-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17). |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1335-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Lowen, Tokioka. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-17-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-22 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 40) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Nishihara). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-22. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2710) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2144) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2078 (Same As) 2022-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).